TOWNSEND v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: KAREN TOWNSEND
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00082
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 1:19cv82-AW/GRJ.
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KAREN TOWNSEND. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service as to U.S. Attorney's Office, #2 Exhibit Service as to Office of Attorney General - DOJ, #3 Exhibit Service as to Office of Chief Counsel - VA) (WARDELL, JAMES)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (bkp)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WARDELL, JAMES)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Summons to USA by Karen Townsend (WARDELL, JAMES)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages Under the Federal Tort Claims Act against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4479169.), filed by Karen Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B) (WARDELL, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOWNSEND v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN TOWNSEND
Represented By: JAMES ANDREW WARDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?