SEVERANCE v. PLYCEM USA LLC et al

Plaintiff: Robert Severance
Defendant: Plycem USA, LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A.B. De C.V., PLYCEM USA LLC, PLYCEM USA INC, ELEMENTIA S A B DE C V and ELEMENTIA USA INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00088
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 7 Case Transferred Out to Another District. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:19-cv-01659, filed 06/07/2019. (atm)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Interdistrict Transfer to the District of South Carolina, located at 83 Meeting Street, Charleston, South Carolina 29401 re MDL 2886. (atm)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) re MDL No. 2886 to District of South Carolina) (Attachments: #1 attachment) (atm)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF TEXT ONLY ENTRY, MINUTE ORDER RE Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-54) Finalized on 5/29/19. Please see pleading (4 in FLN/1:19-cv-00088, 55 in MDL No. 2886). (atm)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-3) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (2 in FLN/1:19-cv-00088, 53 in MDL No. 2886) (atm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons) (atm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (atm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4489965.), filed by Robert Severance. (Attachments: #1 Flat - Elementia S.A.B. De C.V. (Summons), #2 Flat - Elementia USA Inc. (Summons), #3 Flat - Plycem USA Inc. (Summons), #4 Flat - Plycem USA LLC (Summons), #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (HARRIS, SCOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEVERANCE v. PLYCEM USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia, S.A.B. De C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLYCEM USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLYCEM USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELEMENTIA S A B DE C V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELEMENTIA USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Severance
Represented By: SCOTT CRISSMAN HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?