MORRIS v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Plaintiff: BETTY MORRIS
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00103
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #3 INITIAL Scheduling Order - Status Report due by 7/13/2019. (**None filed to date.**) (kdm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER, Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Discovery due by 1/31/2020., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/21/2020., Mediation Report due by 3/13/2020., Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER.) Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/9/2019. (kdm)
July 9, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (kdm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MORALES, MICHELE)
July 3, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #8 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. (kdm)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 7/3/2019. I disqualify myself from this case. The Clerk shall assign this case to another judge. (kdm)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 1:19cv103-AW/GRJ.
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP identifying Corporate Parent WALMART STORES EAST LP for WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP.. (MORALES, MICHELE)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 First MOTION for Discovery Time to Be ShortenedFirst MOTION to Expedite the Production of Discovery filed by BETTY MORRIS. (SCHAFER, SARA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Discovery Time to Be Shortened, First MOTION to Expedite the Production of Discovery by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit #1 - Request for Production, #3 Exhibit #2 - Defendant's Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit #3 - Initial Scheduling Order, #5 Exhibit #4 - Composite Federal Court Demands) (MORALES, MICHELE)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/13/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/27/2019., Status Report due by 7/13/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/29/2019., Discovery due by 10/10/2019., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/31/2019. (kdm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tss)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP from Eighth Judicial Circuit, Alachua County, FL, case number 2019 CA 000970. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4519173.), filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B: Request for Admissions/Response, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C: Notice of Filing Removal) (MORALES, MICHELE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORRIS v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Represented By: MICHELE DENISE MORALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY MORRIS
Represented By: SARA BETH SCHAFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?