GUTHRIE v. KENNETH O LESTER CO INC et al
Plaintiff: JAMES GUTHRIE
Defendant: KENNETH O LESTER CO INC and PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00106
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 26 Disclosures by KENNETH O LESTER CO INC. (SWARTZ, JUSTIN)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 8/6/19. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Motions due by 12/16/2019. Mediation Report due by 12/27/2019. Jury Trial set for 3/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. Case referred to mediation. (tss)
August 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (bkp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SWARTZ, JUSTIN)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT (Unilateral) Regarding Discovery Activities by KENNETH O LESTER CO INC, PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC. (SWARTZ, JUSTIN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC identifying Corporate Parent PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP COMPANY, Corporate Parent PFGC, Inc. for PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC.. (SWARTZ, JUSTIN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by KENNETH O LESTER CO INC identifying Corporate Parent PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP COMPANY, Corporate Parent PFGC, Inc. for KENNETH O LESTER CO INC.. (SWARTZ, JUSTIN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN STEPHEN SWARTZ on behalf of KENNETH O LESTER CO INC, PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC (SWARTZ, JUSTIN)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 1:19cv106-AW/GRJ.
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/17/19. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/1/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/31/2019. Discovery due by 10/15/2019. (tss)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT as to JAMES GUTHRIE. (**Mailed to: Odell J Brown, III, Law Offices of VeRonica R Owens, 189 South Lawrence Boulevard, Keystone Heights FL 32656.**) (kdm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to JAMES GUTHRIE. (**Mailed to: Odell J Brown, III, Law Offices of VeRonica R Owens, 189 South Lawrence Boulevard, Keystone Heights FL 32656.**) (kdm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT as to JAMES GUTHRIE. (**Mailed to: VeRonica R Owens, Law Offices of VeRonica R Owens, 189 South Lawrence Boulevard, Keystone Heights FL 32656.**) (kdm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to JAMES GUTHRIE. (**Mailed to Attorney: VeRonica R Owens, Law Offices of VeRonica R Owens, 189 South Lawrence Boulevard, Keystone Heights FL 32656.**) (kdm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) by Performance Food Group, Inc.. (LAMBERT, JOANNE)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Kenneth O. Lester Company, Inc.. (LAMBERT, JOANNE)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LAMBERT, JOANNE)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Performance Food Group, Inc., Kenneth O. Lester Company, Inc. from Eighth Judicial Circuit in and for Alachua County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-1074. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4521344.), filed by Performance Food Group, Inc., Kenneth O. Lester Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (LAMBERT, JOANNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUTHRIE v. KENNETH O LESTER CO INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH O LESTER CO INC
Represented By: JOANNE BRADDOCK LAMBERT
Represented By: JUSTIN STEPHEN SWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC
Represented By: JOANNE BRADDOCK LAMBERT
Represented By: JUSTIN STEPHEN SWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GUTHRIE
Represented By: VERONICA R OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?