TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. COVERT et al
Plaintiff: TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ANNIE COVERT, DESTINY COVERT, JOHN DOE, SARAH MANNING, AHMAND WHITE, WILLIAM JOHNSON and CYNTHIA JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv00110
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #7 Answer to #1 Complaint. (kdm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ANNIE COVERT. (kdm)
July 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: ANNIE COVERT answer due 7/29/2019. (tss)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Annie Covert on July 8, 2019, filed by TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (MIRILOVIC, LENA)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 1:19cv110-AW/GRJ.
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D LERNER on behalf of TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (LERNER, JOSHUA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ANNIE COVERT, DESTINY COVERT, CYNTHIA JOHNSON, WILLIAM JOHNSON, SARAH MANNING, AHMAND WHITE. (kdm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MIRILOVIC, LENA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4521685.), filed by TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy Applicaton, #2 Exhibit Policy Application, #3 Exhibit Specimen Policy, #4 Exhibit Policy Application, #5 Exhibit Policy, #6 Exhibit 2008 POA, #7 Exhibit 2011 POA, #8 Exhibit Benefit Form Change, #9 Exhibit 2018 POA, #10 Exhibit 6/6/2018 Letter, #11 Exhibit 7/3/2018 Fax, #12 Exhibit 7/9/2018 Fax, #13 Exhibit 7/25/18 Letter, #14 Exhibit 9/11/2018 Letter, #15 Exhibit 8/17/2018 Letter, #16 Summons for Annie Covert, #17 Summons for Ahmand White, #18 Summons for Sarah Manning, #19 Summons for Destiny Covert, #20 Summons for Cynthia Johnson, #21 Summons for William Johnson) (MIRILOVIC, LENA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. COVERT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNIE COVERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESTINY COVERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMAND WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYNTHIA JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSAMERICA PREMIER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: LENA MARGUERITE MIRILOVIC
Represented By: JOSHUA D LERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?