DARLING v. INCH
Petitioner: REGINALD W DARLING
Respondent: MARK S INCH
Case Number: 1:2019cv00149
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations (tss)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to Magistrate Judge's #4 Report and Recommendations by REGINALD W DARLING. (kdm)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part and denying in part re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/25/2019). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/4/2019. (atm)
September 3, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Referred to GARY R JONES. (tss)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by REGINALD W DARLING. (tss)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254, ECF No. #1 , should be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/5/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/3/2019. (atm)
August 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #3 HABEAS CORPUS Filing fee Received. (kdm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 HABEAS CORPUS Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 1-3729. Fee status updated to paid. (kdm)
July 31, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (atm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (atm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by REGINALD W DARLING with (2) service copies, no IFP filed. (atm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DARLING v. INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK S INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REGINALD W DARLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?