CRAIG v. THE UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA
Plaintiff: TAISIYA CRAIG
Defendant: THE UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00157
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CLOSING THE FILE, re #4 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 8/21/2019. This order confirms that the case has been dismissed. The Clerk will close the file. (kdm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice by TAISIYA CRAIG (MATTOX, MARIE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to THE UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA. (kdm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4587876.), filed by TAISIYA CRAIG. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk, #2 Summons to be issued by Clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRAIG v. THE UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAISIYA CRAIG
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?