REID v. MORAN FOODS, LLC D/B/A SAVE-A-LOT
Plaintiff: MICHAEL REID
Defendant: MORAN FOODS, LLC D/B/A SAVE-A-LOT and MORAN FOODS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00161
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. MORAN FOODS LLC waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (kdm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PROVIDING USM 285 FORM by MICHAEL REID re #6 Order,, (BIRK, MATTHEW)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order **Duplicate - ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #4 Motion to Appoint Process Server; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/20/2019. (lsd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MORAN FOODS LLC. (kdm)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF, granting #3 , #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #4 MOTION to Appoint Process Server. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/20/2019. The clerk shall issue the summons, ECF No. 1-1, and refer the summons, a copy of this order, a service copy of the Complaint, the completed USM-285 form and the completed AO-398 and AO-399 forms, to the United States Marshals Service (USMS). The clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a form for consenting to trial by the magistrate judge, with the case number written on it. (Forwarded and mailed as directed above.) (kdm)
August 18, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL REID. (BIRK, MATTHEW)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Process Server by MICHAEL REID. (BIRK, MATTHEW)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL REID. (BIRK, MATTHEW)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BIRK, MATTHEW)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MORAN FOODS, LLC D/B/A SAVE-A-LOT, filed by MICHAEL REID. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROPOSED SUMMONS) (BIRK, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REID v. MORAN FOODS, LLC D/B/A SAVE-A-LOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL REID
Represented By: MATTHEW WILLIAM BIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORAN FOODS, LLC D/B/A SAVE-A-LOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORAN FOODS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?