BLANTON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: ALICE LYNN BLANTON
Defendant: SSAOGC, NANCY A BERRYHILL and ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00162
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed ANDREW SAUL served on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (alb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re 4 Summons Issued as to USA. Summons, service copies and order placed in the USMS box for service. (alb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (alb)
September 13, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. (No filings received.) (alb)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. The clerk is directed to terminate Defendant SSAOGC. The clerk shall send Plaintiff three AO 440 (summons in a civil action) forms and three USM 285 forms. Plaintiff shall submit the prepared summonses and USM 285 forms and three service copies of the #1 complaint. Upon receipt of the same, the clerk is directed to issue the summonses. (Order and forms mailed.) ANDREW SAUL added. SSAOGC terminated. (Deadline for forms - 9/9/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 8/26/2019. (alb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN100003740. Fee status updated to paid. (alb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A BERRYHILL, filed by ALICE LYNN BLANTON. (No service copies.) (alb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2019: #1 Supplement) (alb).
August 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLANTON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICE LYNN BLANTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?