MB AUTOMOTIVE MANAGEMENT, LLC D/B/A MERCEDES-BENZ OF GAINESVILLE v. MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC
Plaintiff: MB AUTOMOTIVE MANAGEMENT, LLC D/B/A MERCEDES-BENZ OF GAINESVILLE
Defendant: MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00178
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MB AUTOMOTIVE MANAGEMENT, LLC D/B/A MERCEDES-BENZ OF GAINESVILLE. MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC waiver sent on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (ALLEN, JASON)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC. (atm)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ALLEN, JASON)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4614909.), filed by MB AUTOMOTIVE MANAGEMENT, LLC D/B/A MERCEDES-BENZ OF GAINESVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Summons in a Civil Action) (ALLEN, JASON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MB AUTOMOTIVE MANAGEMENT, LLC D/B/A MERCEDES-BENZ OF GAINESVILLE v. MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MB AUTOMOTIVE MANAGEMENT, LLC D/B/A MERCEDES-BENZ OF GAINESVILLE
Represented By: JASON TODD ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?