BOSTON v. OPTIONS MEDICAL LLC
Plaintiff: KATHRYN BOSTON
Defendant: ORTHOFIX MEDICAL INC and OPTIONS MEDICAL LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00180
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00654. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 11, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TXE100019283 (aam, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
September 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Options Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(rpc, ) FROM CASE NUMBER 4:19-cv-438 [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Options Medical, LLC, filed by Kathryn Boston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rpc, ) FROM CASE NUMBER 4:19-cv-438. [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendant Options Medical, LLC's Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) and Rule 12(b)(6) (Dkt. #11) is hereby GRANTED in part as to Rule 12(b)(2). Accordingly, the Court SEVERS all claims against Defendant Options Medical, LLC and directs the Clerk of the Court to TRANSFER it to the Northern District of Florida in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/9/2019. FROM CASE NUMBER 4:19-cv-438. (rpc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOSTON v. OPTIONS MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHOFIX MEDICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTIONS MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?