BACHARACH v. A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC et al
Plaintiff: N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr and N ALBERT BACHARACH, JR
Defendant: WESTMINSTER PHARMACEUTICALS., NORTHWIND PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC, AUROBINDO, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., HETERO LABS LTD., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HETERO DRUGS, LIMITED, SCIEGEN PHARMACEUTICALS, HUAHAI U.S. INC., GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC., HETERO USA INC., ACTAVIS, LLC, ARROW PHARMA MALTA LTD, SOLCO HEALTHCARE US, LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, AVKARE, INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., HUAHAI US INC, WESTMINSTER PHARMACEUTICALS, HETERO USA INC, GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY INC, HETERO LABS LTD, CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC, ACTAVIS LLC, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, AVKARE INC, PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC, SOLCO HEALTHCARE US LLC, NORTHWIND PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD, HETERO DRUGS LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC and ACTAVIS PHARMA INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00310
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 19 Interdistrict Transfer to the US District Court for the District of New Jersey. (New NJ#: 1:20-cv-00656.) (kdm)
January 9, 2020 Filing 19 Interdistrict Transfer to the US District Court for the District of New Jersey, Office of the Clerk, Clarkson S. Fisher Building & U.S. Courthouse, 402 East State Street Room 2020, Trenton, NJ 08608. (MDL No. 2875) (kdm)
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -15) from United States District Court forthe District of New Jersey re #1 Complaint. MDL No. 2875. (***This is a certified copy - this case will be transferred to New Jersey.***) (kdm)
January 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE Of MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-15)Finalized on 1/7/2020. re #1 Complaint. MDL No. 2875. (kdm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL STUART ROTHSTEIN on behalf of N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons for AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, #2 Summons for AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, #3 Summons for AVKARE, INC, #4 Summons for HUAHAI U.S. INC., #5 Summons for PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC, #6 Summons for SOLCO HEALTHCARE US, LLC, #7 Summons for TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD, #8 Summons for TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., #9 Summons for ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD, #10 Summons for ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC) (tss)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Summons to be Issued by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, AUROBINDO, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, AVKARE INC, HUAHAI US INC, PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC, SOLCO HEALTHCARE US LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, filed by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr. (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4726989.), filed by N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr. (ROTHSTEIN, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BACHARACH v. A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTMINSTER PHARMACEUTICALS.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWIND PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO LABS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO DRUGS, LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCIEGEN PHARMACEUTICALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUAHAI U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARROW PHARMA MALTA LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLCO HEALTHCARE US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVKARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUAHAI US INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTMINSTER PHARMACEUTICALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO LABS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVKARE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLCO HEALTHCARE US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWIND PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO DRUGS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr
Represented By: PAUL STUART ROTHSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N ALBERT BACHARACH, JR
Represented By: PAUL STUART ROTHSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?