BILANCIONE v. LAMB'S YACHT CENTER INC
Plaintiff: BRYAN C BILANCIONE
Defendant: LAMB'S YACHT CENTER INC and LAMB
Case Number: 1:2020cv00039
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant, Lamb's Yacht Center's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against BRYAN C BILANCIONE by LAMB'S YACHT CENTER INC. (GAMBACH, DAVID)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Cover Sheet and Summons served on 1 on 02/24/2020, filed by BRYAN C BILANCIONE. (ALI, THOMAS)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ALI, THOMAS)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ALI, THOMAS)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LAMB'S YACHT CENTER INC. (bkp)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: re #1 Complaint. TO Attorney THOMAS ALI: Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the CM/ECF event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cle)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LAMB'S YACHT CENTER INC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4863355.), filed by BRYAN C BILANCIONE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 SUMMONS DEFENDANT'S RA, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (ALI, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BILANCIONE v. LAMB'S YACHT CENTER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMB'S YACHT CENTER INC
Represented By: DAVID N GAMBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMB
Represented By: DAVID N GAMBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN C BILANCIONE
Represented By: THOMAS J ALI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?