WRIGHT V. LUKE et al
Plaintiff: DENORRIS WRIGHT
Defendant: GRANT LUKE, DUNAMAN and LAPLANT
Case Number: 1:2020cv00096
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTEN JENNIFER LONERGAN on behalf of LUKE S GRANT (LONERGAN, KRISTEN)
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to LUKE S GRANT. (atm)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF SPECIAL APPOINTMENT, SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON DEFENDANT, AND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF. The Clerk is directed to print a service copy of the First Amended Complaint ECF No. #12 and prepare and issue a summons and must refer the summons to the United States Marshal, along with the service copies of Plaintiff's Complaint and this order. Within ten (10) days from the date of entry of this order on the docket, the United States Marshal or a Deputy United States Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the First Amended Complaint, a summons, and this order upon Defendant Officer Grant. Within ten (10) days after receipt of the First Amended Complaint and this order, Cynthia Reed, or in the alternative Jerry Waters, must serve the First Amended Complaint upon the Defendant at Lancaster C.I. named above, complete and sign the return of service, and return it to the Clerk of Court as proof of service. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the Clerk is directed to forward to Plaintiff a form for consenting to trial by the Magistrate Judge, with the case number written on it. (Notify Chambers on 9/3/2020). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/3/2020. (atm) - forms prepared and forwarded to USM and plaintiff
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #13 is GRANTED to the extent the case may proceed without the prepayment of the entire $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward, the initial partial filing fee of $18.33 to the Clerk of Court. (Fee due by 6/24/2020.) The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the Custodian of Inmate Accounts, Mayo C.I. Annex, 8784 U.S. Hwy 27 West, Mayo, Fla., 32066-3458. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/3/2020. (atm) - copy of order sent as directed.
June 2, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #12 Amended Complaint, #13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (atm)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LUKE S GRANT. (atm)
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against LUKE S GRANT, filed by DENORRIS WRIGHT. (no service copies) (atm)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by DENORRIS WRIGHT. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff (1) a blank Civil Rights Complaint Form To Be Used By Prisoners In Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 1983; and (2) a blank motion to proceed in forma pauperis, with the Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate form. (First Amended Complaint due by 6/11/2020. Fee or Motion for IFP due by 6/11/2020). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/12/2020 - forms sent as directed. (atm)
April 28, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #9 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #1 Complaint. (atm)
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 Notice to Pro Se (atm)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-21439. Original file received.
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/27/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Filing Fee due by 4/30/2020. Motions due by 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP form) (br) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/27/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (br) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/27/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/27/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Denorris Wright. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff has until April 20, 2020 to file any objections to transfer of the case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/27/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Denorris Wright. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/27/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/27/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Correction Officer Laplant, Captain Dunaman, Grant Luke. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Denorris Wright.(mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT V. LUKE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRANT LUKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUNAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPLANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENORRIS WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?