DIXON v. ETHICON INC et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Dixon
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc., DAVOL INC, ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON and CR BARD INC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00148
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 6 Case Transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Southern District of Ohio as case 2:20-cv-03543, filed 07/14/2020. (atm)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Inter-district Transfer to the Southern District of Ohio, Joseph P. Kinneary U.S. Courthouse, Room 121, 85 Marconi Boulevard, Columbus, Ohio 43215 re MDL 2846. (atm)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-58) re MDL 2846 to Southern District of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 email request) (atm)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-58) re #1 Complaint. MDL No. 2846. (kdm)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (kdm)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PRICE, ROBERT)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.R. Bard, Inc., DAVOL INC, ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5418283.), filed by Timothy Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Ethicon, Inc., #2 Summons for Johnson & Johnson) (PRICE, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIXON v. ETHICON INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Dixon
Represented By: ROBERT ELLIOTT PRICE
Represented By: ANDREA R PRESTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVOL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR BARD INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?