SPENCE v. LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Plaintiff: ALICE J. SPENCE
Defendant: LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Case Number: 1:2020cv00165
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL, re #4 NOTICE of Settlement. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/10/2020. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "The parties are ordered to comply with their settlement agreement. The court reserves jurisdiction to enforce the order to comply with the settlement agreement. All claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41." The clerk must close the file. (kdm)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON (FURMAN, WENDY)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/27/2020. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/10/2020., JOINT Status Report due by 8/27/2020 and every 30 days thereafter. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/9/2020., Discovery due by 11/24/2020. (kdm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON from Circuit Court Leon County, case number 2020-ca-000818. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5530270.), filed by LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 State Court Documents) (FURMAN, WENDY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPENCE v. LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Represented By: WENDY LYNN FURMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICE J. SPENCE
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID LIEBENHAUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?