PERGROSSI v. UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER JON PERGROSSI
Defendant: UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT
Case Number: 1:2020cv00195
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Set Deadline - Miscellaneous Deadline to destroy entire hard documents case file if no appeal is filed - by 12/24/2020. (kdm)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #6 ORDER ACCEPTING IN PART #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (kdm)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ACCEPTING IN PART #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/23/2020. The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "This case is DISMISSED without leave to amend as frivolous and/or for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). No restrictions are imposed on future filings unless Plaintiff continues to abuse the judicial process." The Clerk shall also close the file. (kdm)
September 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION --- Objections due 9/18/2020. (*** None filed to date. ***) (kdm)
September 8, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: OMNIBUS ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, ( #4 in 1:20-cv-00182, #4 in 1:20-cv-00184, #4 in 1:20-cv-00185, #4 in 1:20-cv-00190, #4 in 1:20-cv-00191, #4 in 1:20-cv-00192, #4 in 1:20-cv-00193, #4 in 1:20-cv-00194, #4 in 1:20-cv-00195, #4 in 1:20-cv-00200, #4 in 1:20-cv-00201, #4 in 1:20-cv-00203, #4 in 1:20-cv-00204, #4 in 1:20-cv-00205, #4 in 1:20-cv-00210, #4 in 1:20-cv-00211, #4 in 1:20-cv-00212, #4 in 1:20-cv-00213 --- Response to order to show cause due in all cases on 9/4/2020. ( *** None filed to date. ***) (kdm)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis in all listed cases. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/21/2020. (kdm) (*** Please see docket entry #4 to view PDF of order. ***) Modified on 8/25/2020 to add link (kdm).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OMNIBUS ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint (in all listed cases). (Show Cause Response due by 9/4/2020.) Recommended: that each of the captioned cases be dismissed without leave to amend as frivolous and/or for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). R&R flag set ( Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/18/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/21/2020. (kdm)
August 19, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, (No service copies received, no fee paid, motion for IFP received), #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (Affidavit of financial status attached). Referred to GARY R JONES. (kdm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: CHRISTOPHER JON PERGROSSI, 205 SE 16TH AVE, APT 24A, GAINESVILLE, FL 32601. (kdm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHRISTOPHER JON PERGROSSI. (Affidavit of financial status attached.) (kdm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT, filed by CHRISTOPHER JON PERGROSSI. (No service copies received, no fee paid, motion for IFP received.) (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERGROSSI v. UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER JON PERGROSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?