MERZ v. SAUL
Plaintiff: Aaron Andrew Merz
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2020cv00202
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to ANDREW M. SAUL (Office of Regional Chief Counsel), re #6 Order. (kdm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to US ATTORNEY GENERAL, re #6 Order. (kdm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. US ATTORNEY served on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (kdm)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kdm)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/31/2020. The Clerk is directed to issue summonses directed to the Social Security Commissioner, the United States Attorney for the Northern District of Florida, and the Attorney General of the United States, and the forms necessary for service by the U.S. Marshal, stating that Defendant has sixty (60) days to respond. The Clerk must send the prepared summonses, four certified copies of this order, service copies of the Complaint, and the prepared USM 285 forms to the U.S. Marshal, who shall serve a copy of the Complaint and summons upon the named Defendant, the United States Attorney for the Northern District of Florida, and the Attorney General of the United States by certified mail. (kdm) (Forwarded to USM as directed above.)
August 31, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #5 NOTICE OF FILING AN AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS, re #4 Order. (kdm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING AN AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS by AARON ANDREW MERZ re #4 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (BACHARACH, N)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Plaintiff must complete and file a financial affidavit in support due on or before - by 8/31/2020). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/21/2020. (kdm)
August 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (kdm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AARON ANDREW MERZ. (kdm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by Aaron Andrew Merz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Motion to Proceed in FormaPauperis) (BACHARACH, N)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERZ v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Andrew Merz
Represented By: N ALBERT BACHARACH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?