RAGHUBIR V. WARDEN CROSS CITY CI ET AL
Plaintiff: VINODH RAGHUBIR
Defendant: TAYLOR CI, FDLE, TAYLOR COUNTY, STATE OF FLORIDA, BOARD OF DOC, INSPECTOR GENERAL DOC, DOC, MEDICAL STAFF DOC, MARK DESANTIS and CROSS CITY CI
Case Number: 1:2020cv00227
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #3 MOTION for Discovery, #1 Complaint, #6 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Referred to GARY R JONES. (atm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 Notice to Pro Se (atm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:20-cv-01655. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to transfer this case to the United States District Court, Northern District of Florida, Gainesville Division. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/9/2020. (MEH) Copies mailed. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Correction by Vinodh Raghubir. (ALL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Disclosures and Discovery by Vinodh Raghubir. (ALL) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Vinodh Raghubir. (ALL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Vinodh Raghubir. (Filing fee not paid, no IFP Motion filed) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(ALL) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAGHUBIR V. WARDEN CROSS CITY CI ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR CI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF DOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPECTOR GENERAL DOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL STAFF DOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK DESANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROSS CITY CI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINODH RAGHUBIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?