BLASBERG v. ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: ELLIE SHAINA BLASBERG
Defendant: ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00127
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ELLIE SHAINA BLASBERG. ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (HARRINGTON, CHANTAL)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ELLIE SHAINA BLASBERG. (HARRINGTON, CHANTAL)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ELLIE SHAINA BLASBERG. ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (HARRINGTON, CHANTAL)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (atm)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET (atm)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 (to add summons and civil cover sheet ONLY) AMENDED COMPLAINT (Actual Complaint not changed) against ELLIE SHAINA BLASBERG, filed by ELLIE SHAINA BLASBERG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed summons) (HARRINGTON, CHANTAL)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6213662.), filed by ELLIE SHAINA BLASBERG. (HARRINGTON, CHANTAL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLASBERG v. ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLIE SHAINA BLASBERG
Represented By: CHANTAL JACQUELINE HARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTING COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?