BRIJMOHAN v. WATSON et al
Plaintiff: SEAN JEFFREY BRIJMOHAN
Defendant: CLOVIS WATSON, JR, LINDA J STUMP-KURNICK, AARON BRAMI, CHRISTOPHER SIMS, MICHAEL MOORE, STEPHANIE G WILLIAMS and TIMOTHY L PECK
Case Number: 1:2021cv00185
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by CHRISTOPHER SIMS. (BOGAN, BRUCE)
January 5, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by MICHAEL MOORE. (BOGAN, BRUCE)
January 5, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by AARON BRAMI. (BOGAN, BRUCE)
January 5, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by CLOVIS WATSON, JR. (BOGAN, BRUCE)
January 5, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LINDA J STUMP-KURNICK. (CHISTOLINI-GREEN, MARY)
December 22, 2021 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against AARON BRAMI, MICHAEL MOORE, TIMOTHY L PECK, CHRISTOPHER SIMS, CLOVIS WATSON, JR, STEPHANIE G WILLIAMS filed by SEAN JEFFREY BRIJMOHAN. (bkp)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND re #16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by SEAN JEFFREY BRIJMOHAN and denying as moot re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LINDA J STUMP-KURNICK signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 12/22/21.( The other defendants must respond to the amended complaint by 1/6/2022.) (bkp)
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by SEAN JEFFREY BRIJMOHAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint) (HILL, FARNITA)
December 6, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (HILL, FARNITA)
December 1, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SEAN JEFFREY BRIJMOHAN. (HILL, FARNITA)
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by LINDA J STUMP-KURNICK. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/1/2021). (CHISTOLINI-GREEN, MARY)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 11/16/2021. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/30/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/13/2021. Discovery due by 5/6/2022. Trial set for 9/21/2022 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (kdm)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by FARNITA SAUNDERS HILL on behalf of SEAN JEFFREY BRIJMOHAN (HILL, FARNITA)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by CLOVIS WATSON, JR. (BOGAN, BRUCE)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by CHRISTOPHER SIMS. (BOGAN, BRUCE)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by MICHAEL MOORE. (BOGAN, BRUCE)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by AARON BRAMI. (BOGAN, BRUCE)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY SUZANNE CHISTOLINI-GREEN on behalf of LINDA J STUMP-KURNICK (CHISTOLINI-GREEN, MARY)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT Consent to Removal. (CHISTOLINI-GREEN, MARY)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CM/ECF REGISTRATION REQUIRE as to Farnita Saunders-Hill. Service of notice emailed to attorney (bkp)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number FLN 10004258. Fee status updated to paid. (bkp)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bkp)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICHAEL MOORE, AARON BRAMI, CHRISTOPHER SIMS from EIGHT JUDICIAL CIRCUIT - ALACHUA COUNTY, case number 2021-CA-2195 filed by MICHAEL MOORE, AARON BRAMI, CHRISTOPHER SIMS. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRIJMOHAN v. WATSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN JEFFREY BRIJMOHAN
Represented By: FARNITA SAUNDERS HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLOVIS WATSON, JR
Represented By: BRUCE ROBERT BOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA J STUMP-KURNICK
Represented By: BRUCE ROBERT BOGAN
Represented By: MARY SUZANNE CHISTOLINI-GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON BRAMI
Represented By: BRUCE ROBERT BOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER SIMS
Represented By: BRUCE ROBERT BOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL MOORE
Represented By: BRUCE ROBERT BOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE G WILLIAMS
Represented By: BRUCE ROBERT BOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY L PECK
Represented By: BRUCE ROBERT BOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?