BALLARD v. BROLING et al
Plaintiff: JAMES LEE BALLARD
Defendant: JOHN LYON BROLING, CANDACE KAYE BROWER and DAVID KREIDER
Case Number: 1:2022cv00104
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #14 ***UPDATED*** PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE, #15 MOTION to Request Appointed Counsel. Referred to GARY R JONES. (kdm)
July 6, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Request Appointed Counsel by JAMES LEE BALLARD. (kdm)
July 6, 2022 Filing 14 ***UPDATED*** PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by JAMES LEE BALLARD. (kdm)
June 24, 2022 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTARY Information to Add to #8 , #9 Objections to Report and Recommendations by JAMES LEE BALLARD (kdm)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/13/2022. (atm)
June 9, 2022 Filing 11 PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES LEE BALLARD. (kdm)
June 9, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #10 Letter to the Court, #11 Prisoner Consent Form & Financial Certificate. (kdm)
June 8, 2022 Filing 10 Letter to the Court from JAMES LEE BALLARD. (kdm)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 (Second) OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations by JAMES LEE BALLARD. (kdm)
June 3, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #8 , #9 Objection to #7 Report and Recommendations. (kdm)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS AND CLARIFICATION to #7 Report and Recommendations by JAMES LEE BALLARD. (bkp)
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by JAMES LEE BALLARD - It is recommended that the Complaint should be DISMISSED on Younger abstention grounds, and under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and (iii) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted because the claims seek monetary damages against defendants who are immune from such relief, and for abuse of the judicial process. The dismissal of these cases will each operate as a strike under the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Once Ballard has received three strikes, he may not proceed as a pauper in federal court unless he is under imminent danger of serious physical injury. 28 U.S.C. 1915(g).. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/13/2022. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 6/10/2022. (kdm)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 (Second) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES LEE BALLARD. (kdm)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN LYON BROLING, CANDACE KAYE BROWER, filed by JAMES LEE BALLARD. (No service copies received.) (Parties will be updated only after the court has reviewed the amended complaint and specifically directed the Clerk to add the additional parties reflected in the amended complaint.) (kdm)
May 12, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #5 First Amended Complaint, (No service copies provided), (Second) #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (kdm)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/11/2022. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order by certified mail to: CUSTODIAN OF INMATE TRUST ACCOUNTS ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL 3333 NE 39TH AVENUE GAINESVILLE, FL 32609. (kdm) (Mailed as directed above.)
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: JAMES LEE BALLARD, ASO13MNI009026, ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL, 3333 NE 39TH AVE, GAINESVILLE, FL 32609. (kdm)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES LEE BALLARD. (kdm)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN LYON BROLING, CANDACE KAYE BROWER, DAVID KREIDER, filed by JAMES LEE BALLARD. (No service copies received, no fee paid, motion for ifp received.) (kdm)
May 10, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint (No service copies received, no fee paid, motion for ifp received), #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALLARD v. BROLING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LEE BALLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN LYON BROLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANDACE KAYE BROWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID KREIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?