BRYANT v. SWAIN et al
Plaintiff: JUSTIN WALLACE BRYANT
Defendant: SWAIN, KENNEDY, WILLIAMS, HOGAN, BERRY, WALKER, KEEN, HILL and GODBOLT
Case Number: 1:2024cv00096
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (jfj)
June 13, 2024 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:24-cv-01384. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 13, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #3 Prisoner Consent Form & Financial Certificate, #5 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (jfj)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida, Gainesville Division, for all further proceedings. The Clerk shall immediately forward the file to that District and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/12/2024. (MWC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/13/2024.]
June 6, 2024 Filing 3 PRISONER consent form and financial certificate by Justin Wallace Bryant. (LSS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/13/2024.]
June 6, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Justin Wallace Bryant. (LSS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/13/2024.] Modified/reopened on 6/13/2024 (jfj).
June 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berry(Sgt.), Berry(Nurse), Godbolt, Hill, Hogan, Keen, Kennedy, Swain, Walker, Williams filed by Justin Wallace Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(LSS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/13/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRYANT v. SWAIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN WALLACE BRYANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GODBOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?