RAS v. KRAMER
Plaintiff: CUILLIAEAN RAS
Defendant: BRIAN S KRAMER
Case Number: 1:2024cv00240
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint. Accordingly, it is RECOMMENDED: That this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to Rass failure to comply with Court orders. That the Clerk close the file. ( Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 3/17/2025.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/14/2025. (jcw)
February 14, 2025 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 Order to Show Cause - No response filed. (jcw)
January 30, 2025 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #6 Mail Returned. (jcw)
January 29, 2025 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Insufficient Address. Re: #3 ORDER. (Plaintiff's name as well as TARUS WOODALL were not located in FDC or BOP databases.) (jcw)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to his failure to comply with the Court's December 27 Order. (Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2025.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 1/24/2025. (jcw)
January 15, 2025 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order - No response filed. (jcw)
December 27, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff: (1) a set of forms needed to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (for non-prisoners); and (2) a civil rights complaint form (for non-prisoners) in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983. This case number should be written on both forms and Amended Complaint should be written on the complaint form. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall either pay the $405 filing fee or file a complete motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Any motion must include the signature required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.1(E). Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended complaint. If Plaintiff files an amended complaint, it must: (1) be submitted on the Court form; (2) be either typed or clearly written; (3) not exceed 25 pages; (4) include the signature required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.1(E); and (5) correct the deficiencies identified in this Order. (IFP/Fee due by 1/10/2025., Amended complaint due by 1/10/2025.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/27/2024. (jcw)
December 24, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (tss)
December 20, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CUILLIAEAN RAS. (tss)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by CUILLIAEAN RAS (no service copies) (tss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAS v. KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CUILLIAEAN RAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN S KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?