PETERKA v. CROSBY
Case Number: 3:2005cv00022
Filed: January 25, 2005
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 131 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by WALTER A MCNEIL. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 9/16/2009. (jws)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DENYING 127 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment filed by DANIEL JON PETERKA. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/2/2009. (jws)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDERED: re 125 Notice of Non-Receipt of Order and Request (for) the Court to Accept the Accompanying (Motion) as Timely filed by DANIEL JON PETERKA. No action will be taken on the Notice. Petitioner may refile Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment within ten (10) days of receipt of this order. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 2/19/2009. (jws)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DENYING 113 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by DANIEL JON PETERKA. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 12/16/2008. (jws)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DENIED as to 105 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition filed by DANIEL JON PETERKA. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 9/9/2008. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETERKA v. CROSBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?