WICKERS v. UTSEY et al
Plaintiff: CATHY WICKERS
Defendant: JERRY DALE UTSEY, SANTA ROSA COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE, SANTA ROSA COUNTY COMMISSION, JEB BUSH and WENDALL HALL
Case Number: 3:2007cv00290
Filed: July 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 24 . The plaintiff's complaint and this action are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 5/6/09. (amm)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Re: 16 Third Amended Complaint - That this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Pltf's failure to comply with an Order of the Court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 4/6/2009. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 5/4/2009. (laj)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The defendants Wendall Hall, the Santa Rosa County Commission, and the Santa Rosa County Sheriff's Office and all claims against them (Claims Seven, Eight,a nd Nine) are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Claims One and Three against Utsey are DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The remaining claims against Utsey Claims Two, Four, Five, and Sixare REMANDED to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 11/20/08. (pll)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Re: 16 Third Amended Complaint - 1) That claim one (1) against Dft UTSEY, for false arrest and illegal imprisonment in violation of the Fourth Amendment, be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S. C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. 2) That claim three (3) against Dft UTSEY, for excessive force in violation of the Fourtheenth Amendment, be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. 3) That claim nine (9) against SRCSO, for failure to share fingerprints and for unlawful scanning of Pltf's fingerprints, be DIMISSED with prejudice as frivolous pu rsuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). 4) That the following Dfts be dismissed from this lawsuit: SRCSO, Wendell Hall and the Santa Rosa County Commission. 5) That the matter be remanded to the undersigned for further proceedings on the followin g claims: (1) the use of excessive force by Dft UTSEY on July 10, 2003, in violation of Pltf's Fourth Amendment rights (claim 2); and (2) Pltf's state law claims for false arrest, false imprisonment, and excessive force against Dft UTSEY (claims four, five, and six). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/16/2008. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/13/2008. (laj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WICKERS v. UTSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHY WICKERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY DALE UTSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTA ROSA COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEB BUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDALL HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?