DEBORD et al v. G & S MATERIAL SERVICE INC et al
Plaintiff: MATTHEW E DEBORD and TABITHA DEBORD
Defendant: G & S MATERIAL SERVICE INC, EZELL & SON TRANSPORTATION INC and JAMES C PRESSLEY
Case Number: 3:2007cv00365
Filed: August 29, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRAIL re Section I(D) of the 109 Order Setting Trial entered on 6/7/2010: ReSetting Jury Trial for 8/30/2010 with jury selection beginning at 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Pensacola before SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER.) - - All other dates and conditions of the ORDER dated June 7, 2010 remain in full effect. - - - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on June 11, 2010. (cbj)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re 96 MOTION Appoint Mediator, MOTION Extend Mediation Deadline, 97 Response to Motion, 99 Response to Motion. - (See order image)* - - Louis F. Ray, Jr., 118 W. Cervantes Street, Pensacola, Florida, is appointed as med iator in the above styled case. - Within 48 hours, the parties shall agree upon one of the dates above* for commencement of this mediation and shall inform the Court of this result by the close of business on Friday, April 9, 2010. - The remainder of Order of Mediation 95 dated March 23, 2010, remains in full force and effect. - - - (Miscellaneous Deadline - by 4/9/2010. ) - - - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on April 8, 2010. (cbj)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER - Counsel are directed to confer personally and notify the Court in writing within five (5) working days of the expected length of the trial and confirm this case to be a trial by judge or jury. All parties will be notified by separate order of the dates for the pre-trial conference, if necessary, and trial. - - - (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/8/2010. ) - - - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on March 2, 2010. (cbj)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER - - Plaintiff's 79 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is Granted on the issue of liability for the subject traffic accident as described herein and is Denied in all other respects. - - - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on February 22, 2010. (cbj)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER - re Court's Mediation Order 29 - Plaintiff to show cause, within ten (10) days of this Order, why sanctions should not be considered for failing to timely respond to this Court's Order. - Show Cause Response due by 8/12/2009. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on July 29, 2009. (cbj)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER - Plaintiffs' 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and Permanent Injury - will be taken under advisement on June 22, 2009. Parties directed to file and serve responsive memoranda, affidavits, etc., before above date. - (Advisement) Date - by 6/22/2009. Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/22/2009. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on May 19, 2009. (cbj)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - GRANTING 73 Motion for Clarification of Order. The court's order of April 24, 2009 is modified to reflect that Defendants' side is limited to twenty (20) depositions, including those already taken. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on April 30, 2009. (kvg)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. Defendants' motion to quash the deposition subpoena of Dr. Koulisis 61 is DENIED. Given Mrs. Debord's position as a spouse claiming loss of consortium, she may take up to two depositions in addition to Dr. Kouli sis'. No more will be allowed without the court's permission and then only with a clear showing of necessity. Plaintiffs' motion to quash the deposition subpoena of Dr. Six 65 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' emergency motion to quash t he subpoenas of Drs. Benson and Stroble 67 is DENIED. Defendants' supplemental motion to extend the discovery deadline 71 is GRANTED. Discovery is extended until June 30, 2009. Defendants' side is limited to fifteen depositions, inclu ding those already taken. No later than April 27, 2009, every lawyer involved in this case and every member of their support staff involved in any way in scheduling will go to the courts public website at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/attorneys/index .cfm, click on Attorney Resources, click on Magistrate Judge Davis Sample Order on Motions to Compel, and read the sample order. This is what they can expect if things are not worked out. If the parties cannot agree on scheduling a doctor's dep osition within the expanded time, they shall file a joint statement to that effect. The court's judicial assistant will schedule the deposition with the doctor's office, without the parties input, and they will be advised when to be there. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS Discovery due by 6/30/2009Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/20/2009 (lcu)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 65 Plaintiff's MOTION to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Dr. Richard Six, M.D., filed by MATTHEW E DEBORD - Defendants shall respond to pltfs' motion on or before Thursday, April 23, 2009 by electronic filing. Response to motion due by 4/23/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on April 21, 2009. (cbj)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN re 27 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - All Discovery due by 12/17/2008. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on September 30, 2008. (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEBORD et al v. G & S MATERIAL SERVICE INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW E DEBORD
Represented By: THOMAS JOSEPH BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TABITHA DEBORD
Represented By: THOMAS JOSEPH BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & S MATERIAL SERVICE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZELL & SON TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES C PRESSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?