LESLIE SMITH v. PSYCHIATRIC SOLUTIONS INC et al
Plaintiff: LESLIE SMITH
Defendant: PSYCHIATRIC SOLUTIONS INC, PREMIER BEHAVIORAL SOLUTIONS INC and GULF COAST YOUTH ACADEMY
Case Number: 3:2008cv00003
Filed: January 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Okaloosa
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER adopting 354 Second Report and Recommendation. Pla is directed to pay Dfts a total of $53,925.98 in attorneys' fees under Fla. Stat. § 448.104. Johnson is directed to pay Dfts a total of $5,338.20 in attorneys' fees in connection with Pla's unsuccessful Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 motion. The clerk shall enter Judgment accordingly. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on May 20, 2013. (kvg)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER adopting 309 Report and Recommendation. Attorneys Reino, Channapasappa, and Avery are permitted to formally withdraw as counsel for their respective clients. Dfts' 156 motion for attorneys' fees and sanctions is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as follows: The motion is GRANTED with respect to the request for fees pursuant to Fla. Stat. § 448.104 and DENIED with respect to the request for sanctions pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1927. Pla's [2 94] motion for Rule 11 sanctions is DENIED, with Dfts to be awarded attorneys' fees for their expenses incurred in opposing the motion. Dfts shall file proof of attorneys fees incurred in opposing the Rule 11 sanctions motion within 30 days. Pl a is found liable for attorneys fees pursuant to Fla. Stat. § 448.104, and the parties shall immediately commence complying with N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 54.1(E) to determine the amount of fees to be awarded. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on March 30, 2012. (kvg)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER re 156 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by PSYCHIATRIC SOLUTIONS INC, PREMIER BEHAVIORAL SOLUTIONS INC, and GULF COAST TREATMENT CENTER INC. shall be held in abeyance pending resolution by the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals of defendant Tropic Star's appeal of the order denying attorneys' fees in Bender v. Tropic Star Seafood, Inc., Case No. 4:07cv438/SPM, 2009 WL 1616 496, at 1-3 (June 8, 2009). Objections to holding the instant motion in abeyance, if any, must be filed no later than MARCH 26, 2010. Within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of a decision by the Court of Appeals in Tropic Star v. Bender, Case No. 09-15152-HH (11 th Cir. June 26, 2009). Plaintiff shall file a notice with this court indicating that a decision has been rendered. Plaintiff may, but is not required to, submit with the notice additional argument-not to exceed seven (7) pages-in support of her o pposition to Defendants' motion for attorneys' fees. Within the same time, and subject to the same page limitation, Defendants may also submit supplemental argument. If nothing if filed earlier, the clerk shall refer this file to the under signed for a status review on JUNE 11, 2010. Should the parties reach an agreement on the matter of attorneys' fees, Plaintiff shall immediately notify the court. (Miscellaneous Deadline - by 3/26/2010; Notify Chambers on 6/11/2010). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 3/12/10. (lcu)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER. Counsel for each party shall be required to personally meet or to confer telephonically no later than February 12, 2010, as outlined in this order. Within ten (10) days of the date of the personal or telephonic conference between counsel for each party, Defendants shall file a certificate stating that the parties conferred as directed in this order and made a good faith effort to settle the questions of liability for and the amount of attorneys' fees in this acti on, as well as the matter of costs. The certificate shall also indicate whether the fees and costs issues have been fully (or partially) settled or whether the parties were entirely unsuccessful in resolving their differences. (Miscellaneous Deadline, in re: 155 Bill of Costs and 156 Motion for Attorney Fees - by 2/22/2010). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/19/10. (lcu)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER. This cause is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Timothy to conduct evidentiary and such other proceedings as are required and to enter a report andrecommendation on the disposition of defendants' motion. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 1/8/10. (lcu)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER - (1) Amended Complaint 104 filed by LESLIE SMITH is STRICKEN from the court's docket. (2) Plaintiff's Rule 72 objections 131 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by LESLIE SMITH are OVERR ULED. (3) MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Declaration 96 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as moot. (4) MOTION for Summary Judgment 75 filed by PSYCHIATRIC SOLUTIONS INC, GULF COAST YOUTH ACADEMY, PREMIER BEHAVIORAL SOLUTIONS INC is GRANTED. (5) The clerk is directed to enter judgment for defendants and to close this case. Plaintiff shall take nothing from this action. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 3/31/09. (sps)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. The magistrate judge's order 81 is Affirmed. The court's stay of payment is lifted. Counsel shall make payment within ten (10) days of this order. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 11/5/08. Miscellaneous Deadline - by 11/20/2008 (lcu)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. Within TWENTY (20) DAYS of the date of docketing of this order, Richard E. Johnson shall pay to Waller, Lansen, Dortch, & Davis, LLP, the law firm at which both Attorney Peters and Channabasappa are employed, the sum of $1,470.60. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 9/12/08. (lcu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LESLIE SMITH v. PSYCHIATRIC SOLUTIONS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE SMITH
Represented By: ANDREA LYNN REINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSYCHIATRIC SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: ALFRED BENJAMIN GORDON, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER BEHAVIORAL SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GULF COAST YOUTH ACADEMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?