LINDSAY v. MCNEIL
Petitioner: MICHAEL LINDSAY
Respondent: WALTER A MCNEIL
Case Number: 3:2008cv00084
Filed: February 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Presiding Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying 34 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 03/08/2010. (jmd)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 27 Report and Recommendation. - The 28 U.S.C. § 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus filed by Michael W.Lindsey challenging his conviction for aggravated battery with great bodily harm or with a deadly weapon in the Circuit Court of the First Judicial Circuit, in and for Escambia County, Florida, case number 02-5354-CF, is hereby Denied With Prejudice. - - - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on January 27, 2010. (cbj)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, it is RECOMMENDED that 28 U.S.C. § 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus filed by Michael W. Lindsey challenging his conviction for aggravated battery with great bodily harm or with a deadly weapon in the Circuit Court of the First Judicial Circuit, in and for Escambia County, Florida, case number 02-5354-CF, be DENIED WITH PREJUDICE re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MICHAEL LINDSEY - R&R flag set. R&R MOTION UTILITY for Prisoner Cases. ( Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 1/13/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 12/16/09. (pll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINDSAY v. MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL LINDSAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WALTER A MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?