MARTS ET AL v. MCNESBY ET AL
Plaintiff: SIDNEY MARTS
Defendant: RON MCNESBY, ESCAMBIA COUNTY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, TIMOTHY O YOUNG, JEREMY SOUTHERN, WILLIAMS, JEFFER, JANE DOE, KROMEC, DONALD UNZORY CARROLL and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 3:2008cv00272
Filed: June 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER ADOPTING 168 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff Richard Lindsay is terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action, and further, that Plaintiff Richard Lindsay's case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with an order of the court. The clerk is directed to change the docket to reflect that Plaintiff Richard Lindsay is terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action. Thereafter, the clerk shall close this file as there are no remaining plaintiffs to this action. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 4/16/09. (lcu)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: (1.) That Plaintiff Richard Lindsay be terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action, and further, that Plaintiff Richard Lindsay's case be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with an order of the court. (2.) That the clerk be directed to change the docket to reflect that Plaintiff Richard Lindsay is terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 3/17/2009. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/14/2009. (djb)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 85 . Plaintiff Darra O. McCree is terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action, and further, that Plaintiff Darra O. McCree's case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with an order of the court. The clerk is directed to change the docket to reflect that Plaintiff Darra O. McCree is terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 1/8/09. (lcu)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that ROBERT JAMES WALKER be terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action, and further, that Plaintiff Robert James Walker's case be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to compl y with an order of the court. That the clerk be directed to change the docket to reflect that Plaintiff Robert James Walker is terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/2/08. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/31/2008 (lcu)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff TERENCE THOMPSON be terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action, and further, that Plaintiff Terence Thompson's case be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to c omply with an order of the court. That the clerk be directed to change the docket to reflect that Plaintiff Terence Thompson is terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/2/08. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/30/2008 (lcu)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 43 . Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal 40 is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff Sydney Marts is terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action, and further, that Plaintiff Sydney Marts' case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The clerk is directed to change the docket to reflect that Plaintiff Sydney Marts is terminated as a Plaintiff in this cause of action. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 11/21/08. (lcu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTS ET AL v. MCNESBY ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIDNEY MARTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON MCNESBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESCAMBIA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY O YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY SOUTHERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KROMEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD UNZORY CARROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?