DOE et al v. SCHOOL BOARD FOR SANTA ROSA COUNTY, FLORIDA et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs alleged that school officials from the Defendant School Board for Santa Rosa County persistently and pervasively promoted their personal religious beliefs in the public schools and at school events.

Plaintiff: MINOR I DOE and MINOR II DOE
Defendant: SCHOOL BOARD FOR SANTA ROSA COUNTY, FLORIDA, H. FRANK LAY and JOHN ROGERS
Case Number: 3:2008cv00361
Filed: August 27, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1983 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER - - CEAI's 260 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Requesting Memoranda on Mootness is Denied. - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on May 6, 2010. (cbj)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER re 209 MOTION in Limine. CEAI shall file its response to the plaintiffs' motion on or before November 30, 2009, by 12:00 Noon (Central Time). (Response to motion due by 11/30/2009). Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 11/25/09. (lcu)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER - The plaintiffs' 182 Motion to Strike Christian Educators' intervention pleading is GRANTED as to the First and Second Affirmative Defenses, and as to the Third Affirmative Defense insofar as it seeks to vacate o r set aside the consent decree in its entirety, and DENIED as to that portion of the Third Affirmative Defense which seeks to amend or correct the consent decree to avoid a prior restraint on its members' First or FourteenthAmendment rights. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 10/30/2009. (djb)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER - Granting Pla's 150 Motion to Compel Production, and Winkler must comply as directed. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 8/18/2009. (laj)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - No later than February 13, 2009, but sooner if possible, the parties shall file a joint report advising the court of the progress they have made towards fashioning a proposed consent decree in this case. If the parties have reached full agreement as to the terms of the proposed consent decree, along with their joint report they shall also submit a copy of the proposed consent decree to the court for its review and approval. If the parties have not reached full agreemen t as to the terms of the proposed consent decree, they shall so advise the court in their joint report and identify the area(s) of disagreement. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 1/21/2009. (Joint Report due by 2/13/2009.) (djb)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - Re: 47 Scheduling Conference - 1) This temporary injuction becomes effective at 12:00 p.m., 1/19/2009. The injunction will remain in effect for a period of (90) days or until further notice by the Court. 2) This ma tter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth M. Timothy by separate Order, with instructions and a timetable for supervising the parties' efforts to fashion permanent relief in the form of a consent decree. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 1/9/2009. (laj)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - The courts order dated December 10, 2008, (doc. 38 ) granting defendants Motion to Vacate Protective Order to Proceed Pseudononymously is hereby VACATED. Defendants Motion to Vacate Protective Order to Proceed Pseudononymo usly (doc. 34 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to refund any fees associated with the 39 Notice of Appeal of the vacated order. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 12/10/2008. (djb) (copy (pdf) of this order emailed to Tallahassee Finance Office.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE et al v. SCHOOL BOARD FOR SANTA ROSA COUNTY, FLORIDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHOOL BOARD FOR SANTA ROSA COUNTY, FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. FRANK LAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINOR I DOE
Represented By: BENJAMIN JAMES STEVENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINOR II DOE
Represented By: BENJAMIN JAMES STEVENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?