MARTS v. CHANCE
Plaintiff: SIDNEY MARTS
Defendant: CHANCE
Case Number: 3:2008cv00537
Filed: December 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - DENYING 41 Second Action Motion for Stay with Motion to Vacate Judgment as to SIDNEY MARTS. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on February 24, 2009. (kvg)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - DENYING AS MOOT 27 Request/Motion for Clerk to Designate Record. Plaintiff's request is unnecessary. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on February 9, 2009. (kvg)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 21 Report and Recommendation. This cause is dismissed without prejudice as malicious pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) for plaintiff's abuse of the judicial process. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 1/28/2009. (djb)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this cause be dismissed without prejudice as malicious pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B)(i) for plaintiff's abuse of the judicial process. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on 1/13/09. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/10/2009 (lcu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTS v. CHANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIDNEY MARTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?