RICHES v. ANISTON
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LEE RICHES
Defendant: JENNIFER ANISTON
Case Number: 3:2009cv00063
Filed: February 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with an order of the court. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 9/28/09. (lcu)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by JONATHAN LEE RICHES: It is recommended - That this case be Dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to comply with an order of the court. - - Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/18/2009. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on August 21, 2009. (cbj)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by JONATHAN LEE RICHES - Clerk shall send Plaintiff an IFP motion and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate w/this case number written on them. - Pltf shall either pay $350.00 filing fe e, or submit completed IFP motion within THIRTY (30) DAYS from docket date of this order. FILING Fee due by 3/25/2009 ; Alternatively, IFP Motion due by 3/25/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on February 23, 2009.(cc: Riches w/ifp) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHES v. ANISTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LEE RICHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER ANISTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?