BESSMAN v. TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: PAUL M BESSMAN
Defendant: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2009cv00123
Filed: March 24, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final summary judgment in favor of Travelers, consistent with this order, and tax costs against the plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on March 29, 2011. (kvg)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Travelers' Motion to Reopen the Summary Judgment Deadline 33 is GRANTED, however, Travelers' is not invited to file a new motion for summary judgment. Instead, the court will consider Travelers' previously filed motion for summary judgment along with the new affidavits of Jim Geisinger and Paul Vaughn. Travelers' Motion for Reconsideration and Relief from Judgment 34 is DENIED as moot. On or before May 10, 2010, Bessman shall respond solely o n the issue of Jim Geisinger's authority to sign an uninsured motorist selection form on behalf of Hope Lumber. The court does not invite argument on any other issue in this case. (Response to motion due by 5/10/2010). Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 4/26/10. (lcu)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA - The court will take the motion under advisement on September 2, 2009. - (see order image) - Miscellaneous Deadline (advisement date) - by 9/2/2009. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on August 19, 2009. (cbj)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion to Compel (the motion having been withdrawn 20 ). Within ten (10) days the plaintiffs shall pay $1000.00 to defendant as a sanction for that party's costs in defending the instant motio n to compel. Either party may within ten days seek reconsideration of the sanction or the amount by filing a motion to reconsider with brief argument and supporting documentation, in which case the requirement for payment will be stayed until the matter is resolved. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on 7/24/09. (lcu)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 MOTION to Compel filed by PAUL M BESSMAN. Counsel will immediately provide a copy of this order to their respective clients. Defendant shall respond to the plaintiffs' motion no later than the third workday aft er the docketing of this order (the response date) by electronic filing. If counsel are able to completely resolve the issues raised in the motion without meeting, a notice withdrawing the motion should be filed. If the issues are not completely res olved, lead counsel or attorneys with full authority to make decisions and bind the client without later seeking approval from a supervising attorney, house counsel, or some other decision maker will, no later than the fifth workday after the respons e date, meet personally or by video conference and in good faith attempt to resolve or narrow the dispute. If counsel cannot agree on a time, date or location for the meeting, the meeting will be held at 8:00 a.m. on the fifth workday after the respo nse date in the witness room outside Courtroom 3 North, at the United States Courthouse in Pensacola, Florida. If the attorneys meet at the Courthouse, lead counsel will attend. No later than two workdays thereafter, the parties will jointly file the results of their discussion, including all agreements, undertakings, promises and/or concessions, and will specifically identify any issues that remain for determination by the court, without argument. If in good faith and for good cause you need mo re time, ask, but do not abuse the invitation. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/23/2009, Miscellaneous Deadline - by 7/30/2009, and Status Report due by 8/3/2009). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on 7/20/09. (lcu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BESSMAN v. TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL M BESSMAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M VLACHOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: SINA BAHADORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?