UNIVERSAL AM-CAN, LTD. v. ACCURATE WELDING SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL AM-CAN, LTD.
Defendant: ACCURATE WELDING SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv00292
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Okaloosa
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 12 Amended Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and 20 Affidavit. The Carmack Amendment to the Interstate Commerce Act, 49 U.S.C. § 1476, exclusively governs the freight loss and damage claim filed by Accura te Welding. The liability of Universal to Accurate Welding has been limited to ten cents per pound, and the maximum amount of damages recoverable by Accurate Welding from Universal on its claim is $4,200.00. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on JUNE 14, 2010. (kvg)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order Universal shall file an additional affidavit specifically identifying the manufacturer of the damaged welding machine in this case. (Miscellaneous Deadline - by 4/28/2010) Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 4/14/10. (lcu)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 8 MOTION for Entry of Default. Universal shall file an amended motion within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order showing how it has limited its liability to Accurate Welding, according to the Eleventh Circuit& #039;s four-part test. Universal shall also file an affidavit within fourteen days stating specific facts supporting its claim that the damaged machine was a "used commodity" as defined in tariff Item 137. The affidavit shall identify the party that created the bill of lading between Universal and Chromalloy and the party that filled in its blank. (Miscellaneous Deadline - by 3/10/2010). Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 2/24/10. (lcu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNIVERSAL AM-CAN, LTD. v. ACCURATE WELDING SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL AM-CAN, LTD.
Represented By: JEFFREY DAVID COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCURATE WELDING SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?