SPICER-BANKS v. ELLIS
Plaintiff: BRANDON L SPICER-BANKS
Defendant: D ELLIS, WALTER A MCNEIL, INSPECTOR GENERAL, WATSON, K V HOENE, D WATERS, R TIFFT, HARRIS, WOOTEN, J B JOHNSON, WALLACE, J CHANEY, J C ROBERTS, D JOHNSON, GIBBS and GOEN
Case Number: 3:2009cv00425
Filed: September 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ADOPTING 48 THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Judgment to be entered stating, "The plaintiff's second amended complaint and this case are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii)." Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 04/12/2010. (krb)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - - 1. Plaintiff's 41 Notice Of Inquiry, construed as a motion to amend complaint is Granted. - 2. Clerk to forward to plaintiff a complaint form (42 USC 1983pr), with this case number written on it. - 3. Plaintiff sh all have thirty (30) days from docketing date of this order to file "Second Amended Complaint." Alternatively, plaintiff may file voluntary dismissal. - - (Amended Pleadings due by 3/8/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on February 5, 2010.- - (form to pla) (cbj)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Discovery is Denied without prejudice. - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on January 26, 2010. (cbj)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Dismiss is Denied as moot. - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on November 9, 2009. (cbj)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by BRANDON L SPICER-BANKS - The clerk to forward to Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners in actions under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, with this case number written on the form. - With in thirty (30) days from docketing date of this order, Pla shall file an Amended Complaint as directed. - - ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2009. ) - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on November 3, 2009.- - (form to pla) (cbj)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Plaintiff's 8 MOTION Of Inquiry, construed as a motion for an extension of time is Granted. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from docketing date of this order to pay initial partial filing fee ($2.83). - - (Initial partial filing Fee due by 11/16/2009. ) - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on October 15, 2009. (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPICER-BANKS v. ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON L SPICER-BANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER A MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPECTOR GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K V HOENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D WATERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R TIFFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOOTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J B JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J CHANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?