BETHEL v. ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA
Plaintiff: ORLANDO BETHEL
Defendant: ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA
Case Number: 3:2009cv00432
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Presiding Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 38 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by GLYNIS BETHEL, ORLANDO BETHEL - - Plaintiffs' motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is Denied, and they are directed to pay the full appellate filing fee of $455.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of docketing of this order. (Appellate filing Fee due by 12/21/2009. ) - - - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on November 20, 2009. (cbj)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 32 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, 33 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, and 34 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by GLYNIS BETHEL and ORLANDO BETHEL. The orders appealed are AFFIRMED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 11/12/09. (lcu)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Plaintiffs' objection 12 construed as a motion to reconsider the court's September 30, 2009, orders 8 , 9 denying them, without prejudice, leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. If Plaintiffs wish to pursue this matter, they must comply with the instructions previously provided by the court. The failure to submit in forma pauperis applications as instructed may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed for failure to comply with a court order. Plaintiffs are advised they may obtain review of an order of this court on any pretrial matter by filing a motion for reconsideration with the district court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), in which they must show that this court's order was clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/15/09. (lcu)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by GLYNIS BETHEL. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff Glynis Bethel a copy of the forms for non-prisoner pro se parties to reques t leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order, Plaintiff shall pay the full $350.00 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis with a properly completed affidavit of financial status. (Fee or IFP motion due by 10/30/2009). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 9/30/09. (lcu) Motion to Proceed IFP and Affidavit of Financial Status mailed to Glynis Bethel
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BETHEL v. ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORLANDO BETHEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?