OWENS v. MCNEIL
Petitioner: JASON WAYNE OWENS
Respondent: WALTER A MCNEIL
Case Number: 3:2009cv00465
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER adopting 43 Report and Recommendation. The 1 petition for writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED with prejudice as untimely. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on June 24, 2011. (kvg)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JASON WAYNE OWENS - - - 1. Clerk to furnish copies of petition with a copy of this order to Respondent and the Atty Gen/FL. - - 2. Respondent shall have ninety (90) days from docketing date of this order to file an answer as directed by this order. - - - (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/3/2010 . ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on March 5, 2010. - - - (MCNEIL R/R# 7008 2810 0002 1522 9665; MCCOLLUM R/R# 7008 2810 0002 1522 9658) (cbj)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Petitioner's 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Denied. Petitioner shall submit $5.00 payment within thirty (30) days from docketing date of this order. - - - (Habeas Fee due by 1/6/2010. ) - - -Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on December 7, 2009. (cbj)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JASON WAYNE OWENS. - Clerk to send petitioner an application to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). -- Within thirty (30) days, petitioner shall either pay $5.00 fee, or submit completed application IFP. - - (Habeas Fee due by 11/27/2009 ; Alternatively, IFP Motion due by 11/27/2009. ) - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on October 28, 2009.- (form to petitioner) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENS v. MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JASON WAYNE OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WALTER A MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?