Austin et al v. Grandview Retirement Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stacey A Austin, Melisa Griffin, Shawna Price and Tamela T Rome
Defendant: Grandview Retirement Center, Inc., Rushan Corporation, Shannon R Harris and Russell L Harris
Case Number: 3:2009cv00480
Filed: October 28, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER entered on 70 Motion to Seal. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk shall return the four photocopied Settlement And Confidentiality Agreements And General Releases to Plaintiffs' counsel. Absent an appropriate showing of the necessity, the documents shall not be filed under seal. The parties shall have the option of refiling these documents electronically. However, they will not be filed under seal. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/30/2010. (jcw)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denied 64 Motion to Enforce Settlement. The clerk is directed to reinstate this case to the active docket. Jury Trial set for 9/27/2010 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Pensacola before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/8/2010. (sea)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER deferred 64 MOTION Motion to Enforce Settlement. The parties shall file the executed Settlement Agreements with the court not later than 7/2/2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/25/2010. (sea)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER This case is dismissed from the active docket of the court. The clerk is directed to close the case file for administrative purposes, and upon the expiration of sixty (60) days w/o activity, the clerk is directed to close the case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/11/2010. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin et al v. Grandview Retirement Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey A Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melisa Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamela T Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grandview Retirement Center, Inc.
Represented By: ERICK M DRLICKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushan Corporation
Represented By: ERICK M DRLICKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon R Harris
Represented By: ERICK M DRLICKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell L Harris
Represented By: ERICK M DRLICKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?