LOWERY v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS H LOWERY, JR
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 3:2009cv00514
Filed: November 17, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Presiding Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting 30 Report and Recommendation. This action is DISMISSED for the failure to state a claim for relief and for seeking monetary relief against a dft who is immune from such relief, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), (iii). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on March 28, 2011. (kvg)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 6 Amended Complaint filed by DOUGLAS H LOWERY, JR - - Within twenty-eight (28) days from docketing date of this order, pla shall confirm his continued interest in this litigation by filing a notice to that effect. - - (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/30/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on November 2, 2010. (cbj)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by DOUGLAS H LOWERY, JR - - 1. Clerk shall send plaintiff a motion to proceed IFP, prisoner consent form, financial certificate, and a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners (42 USC 1983). Thi s case number should be written on the forms. - 2. Within thirty (30) days from docketing date of this order Pla shall (1) pay $350.00 filing fee, or (2) submit completed IFP motion, as directed. Pla shall also file Amended Complaint. - - -(Amended Complaint due by 12/21/2009. - Filing Fee due by 12/21/2009 ; Alternatively, IFP Motion due by 12/21/2009. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on November 19, 2009.- - (forms to pla) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOWERY v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS H LOWERY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?