ATKINS v. WAYNE-DALTON CORPORATION
Plaintiff: DE'UNDRE ATKINS
Defendant: WAYNE-DALTON CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2009cv00561
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Pla shall not later than 1/18/2011 file an amended itemization of costs. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/11/11. (sea)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for Pla against Dft in the following amounts: 1. In accordance with the jurys verdict, compensatory damages in the amount of $12,250.00. 2. Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 2617(A)(iii), liquidated damages in the amount of $12,250.00. 3. Pursuant to the parties stipulation 86 , pre-judgment interest in the amount of $2,000.00. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/16/2010. (sea)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Dft's motion for summary judgment 39 . Summary judgment is granted for Dft against Pla as to Count I and Count II. Summary judgment is denied as to Count III. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 10/20/2010. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATKINS v. WAYNE-DALTON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DE'UNDRE ATKINS
Represented By: BRADLEY SYFRETT ODOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE-DALTON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?