ENGBERG v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: BARBARA H ENGBERG
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Case Number: 3:2010cv00064
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Presiding Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER adopting 46 Report and Recommendation. The 44 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. Pla's counsel, Stacey Penn Clark, is awarded attorney's fees in the total amount of $13,767.43, which shall be paid out of Pla's past due benefits. Upon receipt of attorney's fees: (a) in the amount of $13,767.43, Pla's counsel, Stacey Penn Clark, shall immediately refund Pla the previously awarded EAJA fee in the amount of $5,750.00 and th e previously awarded sum of $5,214.00; or (b) in the amount of $8,553.43, Pla's counsel, Stacey Penn Clark, shall immediately refund Pla the previously awarded EAJA fee in the amount of $5,750.00. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on January 11, 2013. (kvg)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER adopting the magistrate judge's 32 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Application for Attorney Fee Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (doc. 30 ) is GRANTED as follows: Plaintiff, Barbara Engberg, shall r ecover fees in the amount of $5,750.00, for time expended by her counsel in representing her before the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2412 (EAJA). The United States forthwith shall issue a check payable directly to Ms. Engberg. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 1/23/2012. (djb)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; adopting 23 Report and Recommendation. The decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED, this action is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the Report and Recommendation. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/29/2011. (djb)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - re Plaintiff's documents (proofs of service) identified on the electronic docket as 5 Affidavit of Service, 6 Affidavit of Service, 7 Affidavit of Service. - - The documents shall remain in the electronic file, but the court will not consider them until you have corrected the above deficiencies through the filing of a corrected document. - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on April 7, 2010. (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENGBERG v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA H ENGBERG
Represented By: STACEY PENN CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?