MORRIS v. FLA DEPT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES LITTON MORRIS
Defendant: DERRICK JOHNSON, KENDAL MAY, DANIEL LUCANTE, CORIZON LLC and UNKNOWN CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS OF THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 3:2016cv00015
Filed: January 7, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: ROGER VINSON
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER ADOPTING 172 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Corizon's Motion for Summary Judgment (docs. 144 , 145 ) is GRANTED. Defendants Johnson, Lucante and May's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 156 ) is D ENIED as to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim and GRANTED as to Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claim. This matter is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for further pretrial proceedings on Plaintiff's individual capacity Eighth Amendment excessive force claim against Defendants Johnson, Lucante and May. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 6/4/2019. (sdw)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Corizon's motion to dismiss (doc. 31 ) is DENIED. This matter is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for further proceedings on plaintiff's Eighth Amendment deprivation of medical care claim against Corizon. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 08/14/2017. (MB)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's "Petition for Injunction to Enjoin State Court from Sentencing Petitioner Back to F.D.O.C. in Light of History of Official Abuse Evidenced by Pending United States District Court Case, and to Enjoin Future Imminent Acts of Abuse at the Hands of (those same Defendant) F.D.O.C. Officers" (doc. 48 ) is DENIED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 08/01/2017. (MB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORRIS v. FLA DEPT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES LITTON MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DERRICK JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENDAL MAY
Represented By: ERICH B MESSENGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL LUCANTE
Represented By: ERICH B MESSENGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON LLC
Represented By: GREGG A TOOMEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS OF THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?