BHATE ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATES INC v. COX
Plaintiff: BHATE ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATES INC
Defendant: DAVID COX
Case Number: 3:2017cv00476
Filed: July 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2017 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #13 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (MB)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/06/2017. (MB)
November 2, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (No objections filed). (MB)
October 4, 2017 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #12 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) - That this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. That the clerk be directed to close the file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 10/04/2017. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/1/2017. (Mailed to Pro se defendant). (MB)
October 3, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re: #11 Stipulation of Dismissal (Joint). (MB)
October 3, 2017 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by BHATE ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATES INC. (NESMITH, KIP)
September 29, 2017 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE by Clerk of Previously Issued Initial Scheduling Order #9 . *Initial Scheduling Order mailed this date to Pro Se Defendant: DAVID COX after telephone inquiry from defendant. (Defendant's address as shown on Answer #7 , (4950 S Yosemite St, Ste F2-123, Greenwood Village, CO 80111) was verified and docket updated accordingly). (cbj)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/20/2017. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/20/2017. Discovery due by 12/5/2017. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 09/06/2017. (MB)
September 5, 2017 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BHATE ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATES INC. (NESMITH, KIP)
September 5, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re: #7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint. (MB)
August 31, 2017 Please disregard. ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by DAVID COX. (MB)
August 31, 2017 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by DAVID COX. (MB)
August 15, 2017 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on David Cox on August 9, 2017, filed by BHATE ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATES INC. (NESMITH, KIP)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for KIP A NESMITH. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 07/24/2017. (MB)
July 24, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kip A. Nesmith.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-3931595.) (MB)
July 24, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kip A. Nesmith.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-3931595.) by BHATE ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (NESMITH, KIP)
July 19, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DAVID COX. (sdw)
July 19, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BURGE, S)
July 19, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Cox ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3928774.), filed by BHATE ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATES INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons for David Cox) (BURGE, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BHATE ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATES INC v. COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BHATE ENVIRONMENTAL ASSOCIATES INC
Represented By: S GREG BURGE
Represented By: KIP A NESMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?