WALKER et al v. AUTRY GREER & SONS INC
Plaintiff: HUGHLEY ANTOINE, JR, ANTOINE HUGHLEY and A'TOYE WALKER
Defendant: AUTRY GREER & SONS INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01964
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED, and Defendant's request for oral argument is DENIED. The case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Escambia County, Florida, and the Clerk is directed to take appropriate steps to remand the case and close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 09/26/2018. (Order mailed to Circuit Court of Escambia County). (MB)
September 12, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AUTRY GREER & SONS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (MB)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AUTRY GREER & SONS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (GERHEIM, JORDAN)
August 29, 2018 Set Deadlines re #9 MOTION To Remand (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/12/2018). (MB)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by ANTOINE HUGHLEY, A'TOYE WALKER. (ALLEN, ROBERT)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/3/2018. Discovery due by 2/18/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/20/2018. (sdw)
August 20, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AUTRY GREER & SONS INC. identifying Corporate Parent AUTRY GREER & SONS, INC. for AUTRY GREER & SONS INC... (GERHEIM, JORDAN)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (GERHEIM, JORDAN)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AUTRY GREER & SONS INC. from Circuit Court of Escambia County, Florida, case number 2016-00234., filed by AUTRY GREER & SONS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit 1-B, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4a, #6 Errata 4b, #7 Exhibit 4c, #8 Exhibit 4d, #9 Exhibit 4e, #10 Exhibit 4f, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9) (GERHEIM, JORDAN)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Contacted counsel of Defendant and advised that redacted versions of Doc #1 - #3 should be filed. (sdw)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AUTRY GREER & SONS INC. identifying Corporate Parent AUTRY GREER & SONS INC. for AUTRY GREER & SONS INC... (GERHEIM, JORDAN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (GERHEIM, JORDAN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AUTRY GREER & SONS INC. from Circuit Court of Escambia County, FL, case number 2016 001234. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4263482.), filed by AUTRY GREER & SONS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4A, #6 Exhibit 4B, #7 Exhibit 4C, #8 Exhibit 4D, #9 Exhibit 4E, #10 Exhibit 4F, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9) (GERHEIM, JORDAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALKER et al v. AUTRY GREER & SONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTRY GREER & SONS INC.
Represented By: JORDAN W GERHEIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUGHLEY ANTOINE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTOINE HUGHLEY
Represented By: ROBERT CHARLES ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A'TOYE WALKER
Represented By: ROBERT CHARLES ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?