ABEKA BOOK INC v. BLUE ACORN LLC
Plaintiff: Abeka Book, Inc. and ABEKA BOOK INC
Defendant: Blue Acorn, LLC and BLUE ACORN LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02229
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER SCOTT WILLIAMS on behalf of BLUE ACORN LLC (WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/23/2019. Discovery due by 5/9/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 12/10/2018. (sdw)
December 9, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ABEKA BOOK INC. (MENZIES, ROBERT)
December 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE Regarding Counsel by ABEKA BOOK INC (MENZIES, ROBERT)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BLUE ACORN LLC. (MORRISSETTE, HENRY)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by BLUE ACORN LLC. (MORRISSETTE, HENRY)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY TONSMIERE MORRISSETTE on behalf of BLUE ACORN LLC (MORRISSETTE, HENRY)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BLUE ACORN LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BECKMANN, PAUL) Modified on 11/21/2018 to edit title of document (sdw).
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT as to ROBERT G MENZIES. (Attachments: #1 ERIC FRENCH)(mailed to Pla's counsel via USPS) (sdw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE re ROBERT G MENZIES. (Attachments: #1 ERIC FRENCH)(mailed to Pla's counsel via USPS) (sdw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (sdw)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blue Acorn, LLC from Circuit Court of the First Judicial Circuit, in and for Escambia County, Florida, case number 2018-CA-1610. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4337631.), filed by Blue Acorn, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (BECKMANN, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABEKA BOOK INC v. BLUE ACORN LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Acorn, LLC
Represented By: PAUL THOMAS BECKMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE ACORN LLC
Represented By: PAUL THOMAS BECKMANN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER SCOTT WILLIAMS
Represented By: HENRY TONSMIERE MORRISSETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abeka Book, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABEKA BOOK INC
Represented By: ROBERT GRAHAM MENZIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?