PHILLIPS ENERGY INC v. SUNOCO (R&M) LLC
Plaintiff: PHILLIPS ENERGY, INC. and PHILLIPS ENERGY INC
Defendant: SUNOCO (R&M), LLC, SUNOCO LLC and SUNOCO (R&M) LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02370
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SUNOCO LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sunoco LLC for SUNOCO LLC.. (SITLER, MARTIN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4412996.) by SUNOCO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (SITLER, MARTIN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4412975.) by SUNOCO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (SITLER, MARTIN)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SUNOCO LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/5/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (SITLER, MARTIN)
February 5, 2019 Set Deadlines - re: #14 Amended Complaint. Answer due by 2/19/2019. (djb)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PHILLIPS ENERGY INC, filed by PHILLIPS ENERGY INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite A - Copies of Agreement and Addendum, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Termination, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence to Phillips) (GASSENHEIMER, JAMES)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Stipulation. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint, consistent with the parties Stipulation by 2/13/2019. Defendant has 14 days thereafter to file a response or answer. The Clerk is directed to conform the case caption to the amended pleading. ( Answer due by 2/27/2019.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/30/2019. (alb)
January 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Stipulation and order. (alb)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, and Order by SUNOCO (R&M) LLC. (SITLER, MARTIN)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES DARYL GASSENHEIMER on behalf of PHILLIPS ENERGY INC (GASSENHEIMER, JAMES)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC answer due 2/9/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/8/2019. (alb) Modified on 1/15/2019 TO ADD "GRANTED" (alb).
January 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint. (alb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by SUNOCO (R&M) LLC. (SITLER, MARTIN)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN HAYES SITLER on behalf of SUNOCO (R&M) LLC (SITLER, MARTIN)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILLIPS ENERGY INC. PHILLIPS ENERGY INC served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (CHAISSAN, STEPHANIE)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Note to Filer - The below-referenced document was posted incorrectly. Please re-post the document using the correct Event Selection, under "Initial Pleadings and Service" >> "Service of Process" >> "Summons Returned Executed". The system will prompt you for the defendant served, and the date of service, and will then set an answer deadline accordingly. If you have any questions, please contact the clerk's office. Re #5 Certificate of Service filed by PHILLIPS ENERGY INC (djb)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PHILLIPS ENERGY INC re #3 Summons Issued (CHAISSAN, STEPHANIE)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE MARIE CHAISSAN on behalf of PHILLIPS ENERGY INC (CHAISSAN, STEPHANIE)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SUNOCO (R&M), LLC. (alb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (RICH, BRIAN)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4352717.), filed by PHILLIPS ENERGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 SUMMONS FOR SUNOCO (R&M)) (RICH, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILLIPS ENERGY INC v. SUNOCO (R&M) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNOCO (R&M), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNOCO LLC
Represented By: MARTIN HAYES SITLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNOCO (R&M) LLC
Represented By: MARTIN HAYES SITLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIPS ENERGY, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN G RICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIPS ENERGY INC
Represented By: BRIAN G RICH
Represented By: JAMES DARYL GASSENHEIMER
Represented By: STEPHANIE MARIE CHAISSAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?