LEMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Michael D Leman
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2018cv02381
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Normand F. Pizza of Milling Benson Woodward, LLP is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/8/2019. (alb)
February 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Normand F. Pizza.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4399365.) (alb)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Normand F. Pizza.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4399365.) by MICHAEL D LEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (PIZZA, NORMAND)
January 29, 2019 TERMINATED Set Deadlines/Hearings Answer due by 2/5/2019. (alb) Modified on 1/29/2019 to terminate (alb).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Lift Stay. The deadline for defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended 7 days as requested. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/29/2019. (alb)
January 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Lift Stay. (alb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Lift Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (HARWIN, MICHAEL)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE. The motion is GRANTED, as requested. All proceedings in this matter are STAYED and all pending deadlines are TOLLED and extended commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/24/2019. (alb) Modified on 1/29/2019 to correct docket text (alb).
January 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations (alb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (HARWIN, MICHAEL)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Cody J. Acosta of Milling Benson Woodward, LLP is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/10/2019. (alb)
January 9, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cody J. Acosta.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4373146.) (alb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cody J. Acosta.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4373146.) by MICHAEL D LEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing) (ACOSTA, CODY)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Atty General) (alb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE Summons by MICHAEL D LEMAN (LINDSAY, ALLEN)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4356333.), filed by Michael D Leman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LINDSAY, HEATHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Leman
Represented By: HEATHER FISHER LINDSAY
Represented By: CODY J ACOSTA
Represented By: ALLEN WELDON LINDSAY, JR
Represented By: NORMAND F PIZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY HARWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?