NIEJADLIK v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: EDWARD J NIEJADLIK
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2019cv00029
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDWARD J NIEJADLIK. OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (WILSON, GARY)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDWARD J NIEJADLIK. OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (WILSON, GARY)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDWARD J NIEJADLIK. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (WILSON, GARY)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
January 10, 2019 JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WILSON, GARY)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Short Form Complaint) against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4374208.), filed by EDWARD J NIEJADLIK. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, #2 Summons for Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., #3 Summons for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.) (WILSON, GARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NIEJADLIK v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J NIEJADLIK
Represented By: TARA SUTTON
Represented By: MUNIR MEGHJEE
Represented By: GARY WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?