POWELL v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: TERRI A POWELL
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00032
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent CONNECTICUT GENERAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent CIGNA CORPORATION, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Cigna Holding Company for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA CORPORATION for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/28/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/1/2019. Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 2/14/2019. (alb)
February 14, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #6 Answer to Complaint (see proposed initial scheduling order) (djb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TERRI A POWELL. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (WEIDNER, KEITH)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (alb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Summons for Issuance by Clerk by TERRI A POWELL (WEIDNER, KEITH)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WEIDNER, KEITH)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4374395.), filed by TERRI A POWELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (WEIDNER, KEITH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POWELL v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: STEVEN DOUGLAS LEHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI A POWELL
Represented By: KEITH WILLIAM WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?